NV SB433 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making appropriations to the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services for maintenance and repairs and the replacement of certain equipment at certain facilities operated by the Division that provide mental health services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services for maintenance and repairs and the replacement of certain equipment at certain facilities operated by the Division that provide mental health services. (BDR S-1121)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |