NV SB425 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public welfare; requiring the Director of
Title
Requires the Director of the Department of Health and Human Services to amend the State Plan for Medicaid to provide certain additional home and community-based services. (BDR 38-919)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 518. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1044.) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |