NV SB412 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Nevada System of Higher Education to allow senior citizens to audit college classes for a nominal fee. (BDR S-1048)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Nevada System of Higher Education to allow senior citizens to audit college classes for a nominal fee. (BDR S-1048)
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Justin Jones [D] |
Sen. Mark Manendo [D] | Sen. Debbie Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=942 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB412.pdf |