NV SB411 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 466.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 466.
Summary
Revises provisions governing hunting, fishing and trapping. (BDR 45-1177)
Title
Revises provisions governing hunting, fishing and trapping. (BDR 45-1177)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 466. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-01 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-06-01 | To printer. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 840 and further amend. | |
2009-05-30 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-30 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Assembly Amendment No. 840 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 840 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.) To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. | |
2009-05-08 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1082 |