NV SB403 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to effect increases in salaries for positions for sworn officers of the Nevada Highway Patrol. (BDR S-879)
Title
Makes appropriations to effect increases in salaries for positions for sworn officers of the Nevada Highway Patrol. (BDR S-879)
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Manendo [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=875 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB403.pdf |