NV SB400 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a process by which a state agency may obtain certain information in county records at no charge for the purpose of assisting the economic development and population research of this State. (BDR 20-1143)
Title
Establishes a process by which a state agency may obtain certain information in county records at no charge for the purpose of assisting the economic development and population research of this State. (BDR 20-1143)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 508. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-03 | Assembly Amendment No. 615 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 615.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | To Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-26 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 337.) | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-29 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |