NV SB394 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the protection of children. (BDR 38-264)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the protection of children. (BDR 38-264)
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Roberson [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Patricia Farley [I] | Sen. Scott Hammond [R] |
Sen. Becky Harris [R] | Rep. Patrick Hickey [R] | Rep. Melissa Woodbury [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Action of adoption of Amendment No. 909 rescinded. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 909.) To printer. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Education. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 612.) To printer. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |