NV SB391 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for awards of scholarships by community colleges in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-815)
Title
Provides for awards of scholarships by community colleges in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-815)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 461. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1157 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1157.) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1097.) |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 239.) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |