NV SB360 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the sale and title of salvage vehicles. (BDR 43-1244)
Title
Revises provisions governing the sale and title of salvage vehicles. (BDR 43-1244)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | Assembly Amendment No. 663 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-16 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 663.) To printer. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-17 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 236.) To printer. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=982 |