NV SB358 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to renewable energy; declaring the policy of this State concerning renewable energy; revising provisions governing certain reports relating to the portfolio standard; revising provisions relating to the price charged by certain electric utilities for electricity generated by certain renewable energy facilities; revising provisions relating to the acquisition or construction of renewable energy facilities by certain electric utilities; revising the types of renewable energy that may be used to comply with the portfolio standard; revising the portfolio standard for providers of electric service in this State; revising the applicability of the portfolio standard; revising the authority of the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to impose administrative fines or take administrative action; requiring the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to revise any existing portfolio standard applicable to a provider of new electric resources to comply with the portfolio standard established by this act; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the renewable energy portfolio standard. (BDR 58-301)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
2019-04-22SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-04-19SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-19AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 457.) To printer.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 174.) To printer.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback