NV SB346 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies provisions governing the prescribing, dispensing and administering of drugs. (BDR 54-676)
Title
Clarifies provisions governing the prescribing, dispensing and administering of drugs. (BDR 54-676)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 185.) To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |