NV SB339 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 225.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 225.
Summary
Requires the Colorado River Commission of Nevada to review and analyze available information, studies and reports to assess the feasibility of constructing a hydrokinetic generation project below Hoover Dam. (BDR 58-1150)
Title
Requires the Colorado River Commission of Nevada to review and analyze available information, studies and reports to assess the feasibility of constructing a hydrokinetic generation project below Hoover Dam. (BDR 58-1150)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 225. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 266.) To printer. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=943 |