NV SB335 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - In Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - In Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property; authorizing tenants subject to certain actions for summary eviction to request that the court stay the action until a decision concerning an application for rental assistance is made and establishing procedures relating thereto; requiring a landlord to accept payment of rent from a tenant and rental assistance on behalf of a tenant under certain circumstances; authorizing a justice court to establish a diversion program for certain tenants subject to an action for summary eviction; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions regarding real property. (BDR 3-883)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 764.) |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 660.) To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 418.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |