NV SB328 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 193.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 193.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the payment and collection of wages and other benefits. (BDR 53-108)
Title
Revises provisions governing the payment and collection of wages and other benefits. (BDR 53-108)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 193. | |
2011-05-27 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | To enrollment. | |
2011-05-25 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-20 | Taken from General File. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-19 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-25 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |