NV SB317 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
Summary
Requires instruction on financial literacy in the public high schools. (BDR 34-1109)
Title
Requires instruction on financial literacy in the public high schools. (BDR 34-1109)
Sponsors
Rep. Maggie Carlton [D] | Sen. Allison Copening [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Valerie Wiener [D] |
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Assembly Amendment No. 605 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-12 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-07 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 605.) To printer. | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-07 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-06 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 142.) To printer. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-30 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=883 |