NV SB306 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to offenders. (BDR 16-298)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to offenders. (BDR 16-298)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 537.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-02AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-31AssemblyReferred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyAction reconsidered.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateTo printer.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1046.)
2017-05-31SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-05-29SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-05-29SenateAction reconsidered.
2017-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2017-04-18SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-18SenateTaken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2017-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 218.) To printer.
2017-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-23SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=689
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB306.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB306_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB306_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB306_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1125&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=306&fldBillname=SB306
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1164&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=306&fldBillname=SB306
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1418&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=306&fldBillname=SB306

Bill Comments

feedback