NV SB290 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing academic standards in public schools. (BDR 34-678)
Title
Revises provisions governing academic standards in public schools. (BDR 34-678)
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hammond [R] | Sen. Don Gustavson [R] | Rep. Philip O'Neill [R] | Rep. Shelly Shelton [R] |
Rep. Michele Fiore [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Victoria Dooling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-11 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=679 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB290.pdf |