NV SB289 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 355.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 355.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to insurance. (BDR 57-521)
Title
Makes various changes relating to insurance. (BDR 57-521)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 355. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-04 | Assembly Amendment No. 855 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-31 | To Senate. | |
2011-05-31 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-30 | To printer. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2011-05-30 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 855.) | |
2011-05-30 | Amendment No. 715 withdrawn. | |
2011-05-30 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-05-30 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2011-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2011-05-25 | Taken from Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-08 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2011-04-08 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-07 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-06 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |