NV SB283 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to prescription drugs; revising provisions concerning the administration of coverage of prescription drugs under the State Plan for Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program; revising provisions governing restrictions imposed on the list of preferred prescription drugs to be used for the Medicaid program; revising the criteria for selecting prescription drugs for inclusion on that list; authorizing the Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee to close certain meetings under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 38-114)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-19SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-19SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-18SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 552.)
2019-04-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 354.) To printer.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-15SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback