NV SB282 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to peace officers. (BDR 23-539)
Title
Revises provisions relating to peace officers. (BDR 23-539)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 448.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |