NV SB254 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to discriminatory practices; revising various provisions relating to discrimination in housing; providing civil penalties and other remedies for certain violations; authorizing the Nevada Equal Rights Commission to enter into certain agreements with the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development for the Commission to investigate and enforce laws relating to fair housing as a certified agency under federal law; providing that certain conduct relating to seeking an applicant or tenant's arrest record, conviction record or record of criminal history constitutes an unlawful discriminatory practice in housing; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to discrimination in housing. (BDR 18-38)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31SenateTo enrollment.
2021-05-31SenateAssembly Amendment Nos. 610, 746 and 801 concurred in.
2021-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 18.) To Senate.
2021-05-29AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-28AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
2021-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 801.) To printer.
2021-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-27AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2021-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 746.) To printer.
2021-05-26AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2021-05-26AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2021-05-21AssemblyWaiver granted effective: May 21, 2021.
2021-05-21AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2021-05-21AssemblyTaken from General File.
2021-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) To printer.
2021-05-20AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2021-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2021-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 248.) To printer.
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-17SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7786/Overview
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB254.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB254_R1.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB254_R2.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB254_R3.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB254_R4.pdf
Texthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB254_EN.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB254_248.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB254_R1_610.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB254_R2_746.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/Amendments/A_SB254_R3_801.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=7320&voteResultPanel=All
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/GetBillVoteMembers?voteKey=8046&voteResultPanel=All

Bill Comments

feedback