NV SB251 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school districts; revising provisions governing the authority of a large school district to negotiate certain conditions of employment; revising provisions governing mandatory subjects of collective bargaining relevant to school districts; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to employees of school districts. (BDR 34-685)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2023, at 11:15 A.M. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |