NV SB246 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-667)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-667)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 562.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 5, Not voting: 2.) To Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-05AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-06-05AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-06-05AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-06-05AssemblyAction reconsidered.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Lost. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 26.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyAction of referral rescinded.
2017-05-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-12SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-11SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 645.) To printer.
2017-05-11SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-04-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-04-20SenateWaiver granted effective: April 20, 2017.
2017-04-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 110.) To printer.
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-09SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-08SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=570
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB246.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB246_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB246_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB246_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=607&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=246&fldBillname=SB246
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1446&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=246&fldBillname=SB246
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1450&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=246&fldBillname=SB246

Bill Comments

feedback