NV SB238 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to marijuana; authorizing the transfer of a medical marijuana establishment registration certificate and a license to operate a marijuana establishment in certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to inventory control systems; prohibiting the use of a third party by a medical marijuana dispensary or retail marijuana store to sell marijuana and related products; establishing requirements relating to the delivery of marijuana and related products to a consumer; authorizing the Attorney General to perform a study relating to the unlicensed sale of marijuana and related products in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to marijuana. (BDR 32-133)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 629.) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 469.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |