NV SB230 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the boards of trustees of school districts and the governing bodies of charter schools to adopt a policy governing the use of foods and beverages containing trans fats at public schools within this State. (BDR 34-666)
Title
Requires the boards of trustees of school districts and the governing bodies of charter schools to adopt a policy governing the use of foods and beverages containing trans fats at public schools within this State. (BDR 34-666)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-05-06 | To committee. | |
2011-05-06 | Rereferred to Committee on Education. | |
2011-05-06 | Withdrawn from committee. | |
2011-04-25 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 291.) To printer. | |
2011-04-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-10 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |