NV SB226 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to transportation network companies. (BDR 58-486)
Title
Revises provisions relating to transportation network companies. (BDR 58-486)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | To committee. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 943.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 373.) To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |