NV SB215 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes concerning persons regulated by the Chiropractic Physicians' Board of Nevada. (BDR 54-834)
Title
Makes various changes concerning persons regulated by the Chiropractic Physicians' Board of Nevada. (BDR 54-834)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-04 | Assembly Amendment No. 719 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-30 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-27 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-26 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-26 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 719.) To printer. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2011-04-15 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-08 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 92.) To printer. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-03 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-02 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |