NV SB214 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; encouraging the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to establish a comprehensive system for the compensation of the unclassified employees of the Nevada System of Higher Education that contains certain provisions; encouraging the Board to evaluate factors relating to compensation of unclassified employees of the System and make recommendations to the Legislature; requiring the Board to annually report certain information to the Interim Finance Committee if it creates such a comprehensive system for the compensation of the unclassified employees of the System; requiring the Interim Finance Committee to make certain determinations regarding such a comprehensive system for the compensation of the unclassified employees of the System; providing for the separate transmission of certain budgetary information relating to such a comprehensive system for the compensation of the unclassified employees of the System in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes the Nevada System of Higher Education to create a faculty compensation system that includes regular in-rank salary increases. (BDR 34-382)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6358/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB214.pdf |