NV SB210 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to energy; requiring the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to adopt regulations establishing a Community Solar Program; enacting provisions governing community solar facilities, organizations that own or operate such facilities and persons who subscribe to such facilities; establishing the requirements for a subscription to a community solar facility; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-307)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-13Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2019-03-18SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback