NV SB205 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 442.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to off-highway vehicles; revising provisions governing the registration of certain off-highway vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the registration of off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-546)
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] |
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] | Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 442. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 881.) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 106.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |