NV SB205 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; requiring the Administrator of the Office of Grant Procurement, Coordination and Management to create a pilot program to award grants of money to provide matching funds to certain governmental and nonprofit organizations; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Office of Grant Procurement, Coordination and Management of the Department of Administration to create a pilot program to award grants of money to certain governmental and nonprofit organizations. (BDR S-807)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-02-24 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6349/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB205.pdf |