NV SB196 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain employers in private employment to provide paid sick leave to full-time employees under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-682)
Title
Requires certain employers in private employment to provide paid sick leave to full-time employees under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-682)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Bill read. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, June 3, 2017, at 11:15 a.m. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 887 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 15, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 887.) To printer. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 184.) To printer. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |