NV SB193 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208.
Summary
Revises provisions governing dealers in antiques. (BDR 54-1069)
Title
Revises provisions governing dealers in antiques. (BDR 54-1069)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-11 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=545 |