NV SB190 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the decennial census; creating the Nevada 2020 Census Commission; prescribing the membership, powers and duties of the Commission; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Nevada 2020 Census Commission. (BDR S-727)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6332/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB190.pdf |