NV SB180 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the State Supplemental School Support Account. (BDR 34-461)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the State Supplemental School Support Account. (BDR 34-461)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=438 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB180.pdf |