NV SB165 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; revising provisions concerning medical certificates of death relating to a person who self-administers a controlled substance designed to end his or her life; authorizing a physician to prescribe a controlled substance that is designed to end the life of a patient under certain circumstances; prohibiting persons other than a patient from administering a controlled substance that is designed to end the life of the patient; imposing requirements on certain providers of health care relating to the records of a patient who requests a controlled substance that is designed to end his or her life; providing immunity to certain providers of health care who take certain actions relating to prescribing or dispensing a controlled substance that is designed to end the life of a patient; prohibiting certain fraudulent or coercive acts for the purpose of causing a person to self-administer a controlled substance that is designed to end the life of the person; authorizing the owner or operator of a health care facility to prohibit certain persons from providing certain services relating to a controlled substance that is designed to end the life of a patient; prohibiting a person from conditioning provisions of a will, contract, agreement or policy of life insurance on the request for or acquisition or administration of a controlled substance designed to end the life of the person; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or provide life insurance or denying benefits to or imposing additional charges against a policyholder or beneficiary because the insured requested or revoked a request for a controlled substance designed to end the life of the person; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes to provisions governing prescribing, dispensing and administering controlled substances designed to end the life of a patient. (BDR 40-292)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 56.) To printer. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |