NV SB153 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to collective bargaining; increasing the amount of time within which the Local Government Employee-Management Relations Board must conduct a hearing relating to certain complaints; removing certain restrictions on payment of compensation or monetary benefits upon expiration of a collective bargaining agreement; revising various provisions relating to negotiations between a school district and an employee organization representing teachers or educational support personnel; repealing certain provisions governing leave for services to an employee organization and governing school administrators; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to collective bargaining. (BDR 23-405)
Sponsors
Sen. David Parks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 7, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 261.) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |