NV SB150 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to land use planning; requiring, with limited exception, the governing body of a county or city to develop and maintain a water resource plan; authorizing grants of money to certain governing bodies for the development and maintenance of water resource plans; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to land use planning. (BDR 22-775)
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] |
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 228. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 139.) To printer. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |