NV SB140 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to correctional institutions; requiring offenders who are employed in programs for the employment of offenders to be paid a living wage; creating the Offenders' Release Fund; revising provisions relating to deductions made from the wages of offenders; requiring the placement of offenders in certain programs which facilitate their employment in positions upon their release which utilize skills similar to those employed by the offender while incarcerated; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions related to the employment of offenders. (BDR 16-39)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] | Sen. Dallas Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7519/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB140.pdf |