NV SB127 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; increasing the number of members on the board of county commissioners in certain counties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Increases the number of members on the board of county commissioners in certain counties. (BDR 20-855)
Sponsors
Sen. David Parks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |