NV SB126 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises certain provisions relating to permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-335)
Title
Revises certain provisions relating to permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-335)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-05-30 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-03-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-03-11 | In Assembly. | |
2011-03-10 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-03-09 | Read second time. | |
2011-03-07 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-02-07 | From printer. | |
2011-02-04 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |