NV SB123 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain foreign trust companies to request to engage in the solicitation of trust company business in this State. (BDR 55-634)
Title
Authorizes certain foreign trust companies to request to engage in the solicitation of trust company business in this State. (BDR 55-634)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | To printer. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1059.) |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: May 31, 2015. |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |