NV SB116 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; providing for the establishment of a program to provide training concerning the identification of persons who have certain behavioral health conditions; providing for the reporting of information relating to distance education and the effects of distance education on the mental health of pupils and teachers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to mental health. (BDR 39-12)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7429/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB116.pdf |