NV SB114 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to systems for obtaining and using solar energy and other renewable energy resources. (BDR 58-380)
Title
Makes various changes relating to systems for obtaining and using solar energy and other renewable energy resources. (BDR 58-380)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Assembly Amendment No. 844 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-21 | To printer. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-21 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 844.) | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-02 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-01 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 6.) To printer. | |
2009-03-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-04 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-03 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=280 |