NV SB107 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes ethnic and diversity studies in public high schools. (BDR 34-116)
Title
Authorizes ethnic and diversity studies in public high schools. (BDR 34-116)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 494.) To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Prefiled. |