NV SB103 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 282.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; prohibiting certain insurers from discriminating based on the breed of dog at an applicable property; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain insurers from discriminating based on the breed of dog at a property. (BDR 57-826)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 282.
2021-05-27SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-24SenateAssembly Amendment No. 564 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-24SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Absent: 1.) To Senate.
2021-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 564.) To printer.
2021-05-20AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2021-03-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-03-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
2021-03-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-03-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-03-17SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 32.) To printer.
2021-03-16SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-03-11SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2021-03-09SenateRead second time.
2021-03-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-02-10SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback