NV SB10 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 463. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 463. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Nevada State Infrastructure Bank; requiring the Bank to keep confidential certain information; removing the Bank from the Department of Transportation and
Title
Revises provisions related to the Nevada State Infrastructure Bank. (BDR 35-358)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 463. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 991 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 991.) To printer. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 960.) |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 299.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |