NV AJR8 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - File No. 36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - File No. 36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require approval of certain initiative measures by a two-thirds vote. (BDR C-916)
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require approval of certain initiative measures by a two-thirds vote. (BDR C-916)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Assembly | File No. 36. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File for next legislative day. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 17, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |