NV AJR7 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - File No. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - File No. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the opposition of the Nevada Legislature to certain proposed changes to the federal Medicare and Social Security programs. (BDR R-699)
Title
Expresses the opposition of the Nevada Legislature to certain proposed changes to the federal Medicare and Social Security programs. (BDR R-699)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Assembly | File No. 27. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |