NV AJR4 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the President and the Congress of the United States to pass acts to combat illegal harvesting and trafficking of human organs.
Title
Urges the President and the Congress of the United States to pass acts to combat illegal harvesting and trafficking of human organs. (BDR R-92)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | File No. 24. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 149.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |